Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Procedure - Sexual Assault Evidence Collection Kits - Analysis
Sponsored by
Senator Smith
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 33
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring that a sexual assault evidence collection kit be submitted to a forensic laboratory for analysis unless a certain requirement is met; requiring that a victim who wishes to remain anonymous and not file a criminal complaint be informed that the victim may initiate a criminal complaint at a future time; requiring a certain law enforcement agency that receives a sexual assault evidence collection kit to submit the kit and all requested associated reference standards for forensic analysis within 30 days of receipt of the kit; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Opposite:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1096
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): January 1, 2020, June 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2019
Legislative Date
2/04/2019
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2019
Legislative Date
2/06/2019
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {638172/1 Adopted
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Referred Judiciary
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/08/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/31/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {632010/1 Adopted
Proceedings
66
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/31/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
66
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/03/2019
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/18/2019
Legislative Date
4/18/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 33
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2019 2/04/2019 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Criminal Procedure - Sexual Assault Evidence Collection Kits - Analysis
Senate 2/06/2019 2/06/2019 Hearing 2/27 at 12:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/13/2019 3/13/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/13/2019 3/13/2019 Favorable with Amendments {638172/1 Adopted 45
Senate 3/13/2019 3/13/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 45
Text - Third - Criminal Procedure - Sexual Assault Evidence Collection Kits - Analysis
Senate 3/15/2019 3/15/2019 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 47
House 3/15/2019 3/12/2019 Referred Judiciary 47
House 3/15/2019 3/15/2019 Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 4/08/2019 4/08/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 4/08/2019 3/31/2019 Favorable with Amendments {632010/1 Adopted 66
House 4/08/2019 3/31/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 66
House 4/08/2019 4/01/2019 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 67
Senate 4/08/2019 4/02/2019 Senate Concurs House Amendments 65
Senate 4/08/2019 4/02/2019 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 65
Senate 4/08/2019 4/03/2019 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Criminal Procedure - Sexual Assault Evidence Collection Kits - Analysis
Post Passage 4/18/2019 4/18/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 33
Text - Chapter - Criminal Procedure - Sexual Assault Evidence Collection Kits - Analysis
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-926, 11-927 )
Last Updated: 1/23/2020 7:44 PM