Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
To Governor
Title
Department of Labor, Licensing, and Regulation - Workgroup on Public Works Contractor Occupational Safety and Health Prequalification Requirements
Sponsored by
Senators Montgomery, Benson, Currie, Feldman, Forehand, Jones-Rodwell, Madaleno, Manno, Peters, Ramirez, Raskin, Stone, and Young
Status
In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of Labor, Licensing and Regulation to convene a specified workgroup to study and make recommendations regarding public works contractor occupational safety and health prequalification requirements; requiring that the workgroup include representatives of specified organizations; requiring the Department to report its findings and recommendations to the General Assembly on or before December 31, 2014; providing for the termination of the Act at the end of June 30, 2015.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0951
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1486 Session: 2013 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2014
Legislative Date
1/31/2014
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2014
Legislative Date
2/05/2014
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
4/05/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/27/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {527575/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/27/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/31/2014
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
67
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2014 1/31/2014 First Reading Finance
Senate 2/05/2014 2/05/2014 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/04/2014 4/05/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 4/05/2014 3/27/2014 Favorable with Amendments {527575/1 Report Adopted 61
Senate 4/05/2014 3/27/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 61
Senate 4/07/2014 3/28/2014 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 62
House 4/07/2014 3/31/2014 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations 67
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 1/19/2020 9:27 AM