Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Natural Resources - Recreational License Donation Program - Establishment
Sponsored by
Senators Simonaire, Rosapepe, Bates, Young, Zucker, Conway, Waugh, Nathan-Pulliam, and Pinsky
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 424
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing a person to purchase and donate recreational hunting or fishing licenses and any corresponding stamps for specified purposes; authorizing the Department of Natural Resources to issue a donated license or stamp only for use by a Gold Star recipient, a disabled veteran, a disabled member of the armed services, or a permanently disabled person who requires the use of a wheelchair; establishing a Recreational License Donation Fund to provide recreational hunting and fishing opportunities for specified persons; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2016
Legislative Date
2/05/2016
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2016
Legislative Date
3/14/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2016
Legislative Date
3/15/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {474038/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2016
Legislative Date
3/15/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2016
Legislative Date
3/16/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (43-0)
Proceedings
45
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2016
Legislative Date
3/14/2016
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/21/2016
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2016
Legislative Date
3/21/2016
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2016
Legislative Date
3/21/2016
Action
Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2016
Legislative Date
4/06/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
3/31/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {450118/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
3/31/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/05/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (139-1)
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/05/2016
Action
Senate Concur - House Amendments
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/05/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/05/2016
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/10/2016
Legislative Date
5/10/2016
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 424
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/08/2016 2/05/2016 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/10/2016 2/10/2016 Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/11/2016 3/14/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/15/2016 3/15/2016 Favorable with Amendments {474038/1 Report Adopted 44
Senate 3/15/2016 3/15/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 44
Senate 3/16/2016 3/16/2016 Third Reading Passed (43-0) 45
House 3/17/2016 3/14/2016 First Reading Environment and Transportation 46
House 3/21/2016 3/21/2016 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/22/2016 3/21/2016 Hearing cancelled
House 3/22/2016 3/21/2016 Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/05/2016 4/06/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 4/07/2016 3/31/2016 Favorable with Amendments {450118/1 Report Adopted 63
House 4/07/2016 3/31/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 63
House 4/11/2016 4/05/2016 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (139-1) 68
Senate 4/11/2016 4/05/2016 Senate Concur - House Amendments 65
Senate 4/11/2016 4/05/2016 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 65
Senate 4/11/2016 4/05/2016 Passed Enrolled 65
Post Passage 5/10/2016 5/10/2016 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 424
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM