Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Division of Parole and Probation - Central Home Detention Unit - Powers
Sponsored by
Senator Waldstreicher
Status
In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Central Home Detention Unit of the Division of Parole and Probation; authorizing the Director of the Division of Parole and Probation to authorize certain employees of the Central Home Detention Unit to exercise certain powers, including executing warrants for the retaking or arrest of certain offenders and executing search warrants; requiring an employee of the Central Home Detention Unit to meet certain minimum qualifications and training of the Maryland Police Training and Standards Commission; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0839
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2019
Legislative Date
2/04/2019
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2019
Legislative Date
2/06/2019
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/08/2019
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2019 2/04/2019 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/06/2019 2/06/2019 Hearing 2/27 at 12:00 p.m.
Text - First - Division of Parole and Probation - Central Home Detention Unit - Powers
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2019 4/08/2019 Withdrawn by Sponsor
(   3-101, 3-201 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM
Click to return on the top page