Bill Search
Bill number does not exist.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
To Governor
Title
Financial Consumer Protection Act of 2019
Sponsored by
Senators Rosapepe, Lee, Ferguson, and Washington
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing and strengthening consumer protections in certain areas of financial transactions, including mobile home purchases, security breaches, vehicle purchases, money transmission, and other areas; applying certain existing financial consumer protections to new forms of financial transactions; establishing that a mobile home retailer has a duty of good faith and fair dealing; prohibiting a mobile home retailer from steering a consumer borrower to products that offer less favorable terms; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1127
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019, October 1, 2019
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2019 2/04/2019 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Financial Consumer Protection Act of 2019
Senate 2/11/2019 2/11/2019 Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/28/2019 2/28/2019 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/28/2019 2/28/2019 Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 4/03/2019 4/03/2019 Unfavorable Report by Finance
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   12-1001, 12-101, 12-1021, 12-115, 12-901, 12-921, 14-1901, 14-1906.1, 14-3501, 14-3503, 14-3504, 14-3504.1 )
(   11-501, 11-503.1, 11-601, 11-610, 12-1101 through 12-1129, 12-401, 12-407, 12-414.1 through 12-414.3, 12-425, 2-105.1 )
(   7-601 through 7-605 )
(   15-311.4 )
Last Updated: 11/22/2019 9:37 AM