Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Commercial Law - Uniform Commercial Code - Repeal of Title 6
Sponsored by
Senator Smith
Status
In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing Title 6 of the Maryland Uniform Commercial Code governing bulk transfers; making specified conforming changes; and providing that the rights and obligations that arose under Title 6 of the Maryland Uniform Commercial Code before its repeal by the Act remain valid and may be enforced as though Title 6 had not been repealed.
Committees
Original:
Finance
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0412
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2017
Legislative Date
2/03/2017
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Commercial Law - Uniform Commercial Code - Repeal of Title 6
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2017
Legislative Date
2/07/2017
Action
Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/16/2017
Legislative Date
2/16/2017
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2017
Legislative Date
2/20/2017
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2017 2/03/2017 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Commercial Law - Uniform Commercial Code - Repeal of Title 6
Senate 2/07/2017 2/07/2017 Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/16/2017 2/16/2017 Hearing canceled
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/20/2017 2/20/2017 Withdrawn by Sponsor
(   1-301, 2-403, 6-101 through 6-111 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM
Click to return on the top page