Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Vehicle Laws - Right-of-Way Violations - Death or Serious Bodily Injury - Penalties
Sponsored by
Senator Muse
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing a mandatory $1,000 fine for a violation of specified right-of-way provisions contributing to an accident that results in death or serious bodily injury of another; authorizing the issuance of a citation by a law enforcement officer; prohibiting the District Court from establishing a schedule for prepayment of the fine under the Act; requiring that the citation contain specified information; requiring the District Court to issue a summons to appear for trial to a person charged; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2015
Legislative Date
2/19/2015
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2015
Legislative Date
2/27/2015
Action
Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2015
Legislative Date
3/06/2015
Action
Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/18/2015 2/19/2015 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 2/26/2015 2/27/2015 Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/06/2015 3/06/2015 Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   27-113, 27-114 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM