Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Education - Prekindergarten and Kindergarten Assessments - Administration
Sponsored by
Senators Jennings, Kagan, Klausmeier, Waugh, Young, Zucker, and Salling
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 427
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring a statewide kindergarten assessment to be limited to a representative sample of kindergarten students from within each local school system in the State, subject to a specified exception; authorizing a specified kindergarten assessment to evaluate specified skills; authorizing specified county boards of education and specified principals and teachers to administer a specified statewide kindergarten assessment if the assessment is completed by October 1 and the aggregate results are returned within 45 days; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0657
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2016
Legislative Date
2/05/2016
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2016
Legislative Date
3/14/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2016
Legislative Date
3/15/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {694432/1
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2016
Legislative Date
3/15/2016
Action
Laid Over (Senator Ferguson) Adopted
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2016
Legislative Date
3/16/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {694432/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2016
Legislative Date
3/16/2016
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Jennings) {213829/1 Adopted
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2016
Legislative Date
3/16/2016
Action
Special Order until later today (Senator Ferguson) Adopted
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2016
Legislative Date
3/16/2016
Action
Special Order until 3/17 (Senator Pinsky) Adopted
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2016
Legislative Date
3/17/2016
Action
Special Order until later today (Senator Ferguson) Adopted
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2016
Legislative Date
3/17/2016
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Ferguson) {733922/1 Adopted
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2016
Legislative Date
3/17/2016
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Ferguson) {483527/2 Adopted
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2016
Legislative Date
3/17/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2016
Legislative Date
3/22/2016
Action
Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2016
Legislative Date
3/23/2016
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2016
Legislative Date
3/23/2016
Action
Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/24/2016
Legislative Date
3/24/2016
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/24/2016
Legislative Date
3/24/2016
Action
Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2016
Legislative Date
4/04/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2016
Legislative Date
3/28/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {365767/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2016
Legislative Date
3/28/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2016
Legislative Date
3/29/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (139-0)
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
Senate Refuses to Concur - House Amendments
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
Senate Requests House Recede
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
Conference Committee Appointed
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
Senators Pinsky, Waugh, and Conway
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/02/2016
Action
House Refuses to Recede
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/02/2016
Action
Conference Committee Appointed
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/02/2016
Action
Delegates Kaiser, Hornberger, and A. Washington
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/07/2016
Action
Conference Committee Report Adopted
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/07/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/09/2016
Action
Conference Committee Report Adopted
Proceedings
72
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/09/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (141-0)
Proceedings
72
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/07/2016
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
72
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/10/2016
Legislative Date
5/10/2016
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 427
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/08/2016 2/05/2016 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/10/2016 2/10/2016 Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/11/2016 3/14/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/15/2016 3/15/2016 Favorable with Amendments {694432/1 44
Senate 3/15/2016 3/15/2016 Laid Over (Senator Ferguson) Adopted 44
Senate 3/16/2016 3/16/2016 Favorable with Amendments {694432/1 Report Adopted 45
Senate 3/16/2016 3/16/2016 Floor Amendment (Senator Jennings) {213829/1 Adopted 45
Senate 3/16/2016 3/16/2016 Special Order until later today (Senator Ferguson) Adopted 45
Senate 3/16/2016 3/16/2016 Special Order until 3/17 (Senator Pinsky) Adopted 45
Senate 3/17/2016 3/17/2016 Special Order until later today (Senator Ferguson) Adopted 46
Senate 3/17/2016 3/17/2016 Floor Amendment (Senator Ferguson) {733922/1 Adopted 46
Senate 3/17/2016 3/17/2016 Floor Amendment (Senator Ferguson) {483527/2 Adopted 46
Senate 3/17/2016 3/17/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 46
Senate 3/18/2016 3/18/2016 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 47
House 3/21/2016 3/18/2016 First Reading Ways and Means 50
House 3/22/2016 3/22/2016 Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/23/2016 3/23/2016 Hearing cancelled
House 3/23/2016 3/23/2016 Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/24/2016 3/24/2016 Hearing cancelled
House 3/24/2016 3/24/2016 Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/01/2016 4/04/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 4/04/2016 3/28/2016 Favorable with Amendments {365767/1 Report Adopted 60
House 4/04/2016 3/28/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 60
House 4/05/2016 3/29/2016 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (139-0) 61
Senate 4/07/2016 4/01/2016 Senate Refuses to Concur - House Amendments 61
Senate 4/07/2016 4/01/2016 Senate Requests House Recede 61
Senate 4/07/2016 4/01/2016 Conference Committee Appointed 61
Senate 4/07/2016 4/01/2016 Senators Pinsky, Waugh, and Conway 61
House 4/08/2016 4/02/2016 House Refuses to Recede 65
House 4/08/2016 4/02/2016 Conference Committee Appointed 65
House 4/08/2016 4/02/2016 Delegates Kaiser, Hornberger, and A. Washington 65
Senate 4/11/2016 4/07/2016 Conference Committee Report Adopted 67
Senate 4/11/2016 4/07/2016 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 67
House 4/11/2016 4/09/2016 Conference Committee Report Adopted 72
House 4/11/2016 4/09/2016 Third Reading Passed (141-0) 72
Senate 4/11/2016 4/07/2016 Passed Enrolled 72
Post Passage 5/10/2016 5/10/2016 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 427
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-208 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM