Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Tri-County Council for Southern Maryland - Funding
Sponsored by
Charles County Senators and Senator Bailey
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 192
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Increasing, to $125,000, the amount of money that the county commissioners of Calvert County, Charles County, and St. Mary's County are required to appropriate each year for the Tri-County Council for Southern Maryland to foster cooperative planning and development in the region.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0387
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/03/2020
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Tri-County Council for Southern Maryland - Funding
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2020
Legislative Date
2/06/2020
Action
Hearing 2/18 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/24/2020
Legislative Date
2/24/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2020
Legislative Date
2/25/2020
Action
Favorable
Proceedings
35 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2020
Legislative Date
2/25/2020
Action
Motion Special Order until 2/26 (Senator Bailey) Adopted
Proceedings
35 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2020
Legislative Date
2/26/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
36 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2020
Legislative Date
2/26/2020
Action
Floor Amendment {683523/1 (Senator Bailey) Adopted
Proceedings
36 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2020
Legislative Date
2/26/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
36 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Tri-County Council for Southern Maryland - Funding
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2020
Legislative Date
2/28/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
38 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/02/2020
Legislative Date
3/02/2020
Action
Referred Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
39 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
49AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-0)
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
52 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2020
Legislative Date
5/08/2020
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 192
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Tri-County Council for Southern Maryland - Funding
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2020 2/03/2020 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Tri-County Council for Southern Maryland - Funding
Senate 2/06/2020 2/06/2020 Hearing 2/18 at 2:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/24/2020 2/24/2020 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/25/2020 2/25/2020 Favorable 35 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/25/2020 2/25/2020 Motion Special Order until 2/26 (Senator Bailey) Adopted 35 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/26/2020 2/26/2020 Favorable Adopted 36 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/26/2020 2/26/2020 Floor Amendment {683523/1 (Senator Bailey) Adopted 36 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/26/2020 2/26/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 36 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Tri-County Council for Southern Maryland - Funding
Senate 2/28/2020 2/28/2020 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 38 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/02/2020 3/02/2020 Referred Environment and Transportation 39 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2020 3/16/2020 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/16/2020 3/12/2020 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 49AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2020 3/13/2020 Third Reading Passed (133-0) 50 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/17/2020 3/13/2020 Returned Passed 52 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/08/2020 5/08/2020 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 192
Text - Chapter - Tri-County Council for Southern Maryland - Funding
(   13-601, 13-611 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 3:21 PM
Click to return on the top page