Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Vehicle Laws – Manufacturers and Dealers – Transfers of Franchises
Sponsored by
Senator Waldstreicher
Status
In the Senate - Returned Passed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring, within 60 days after receiving notice of a proposed transfer of a vehicle dealer franchise, vehicle manufacturers to consent to the transfer or provide a written statement with specific grounds for the refusal of the manufacturer to consent to the transfer; and altering the standards for determining reasonable compensation to be paid by vehicle manufacturers to vehicle dealers for warranty work.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Opposite:
Economic Matters
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1064
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/03/2020
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Vehicle Laws - Manufacturers and Dealers
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2020
Legislative Date
2/06/2020
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/09/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {588477/1 Adopted
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/09/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Vehicle Laws – Manufacturers and Dealers – Transfers of Franchises
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Referred Economic Matters
Proceedings
49A
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/17/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
51A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (99-36)
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
53C
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2020 2/03/2020 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Vehicle Laws - Manufacturers and Dealers
Senate 2/06/2020 2/06/2020 Hearing 2/27 at 12:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/14/2020 3/14/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/14/2020 3/09/2020 Favorable with Amendments {588477/1 Adopted 48
Senate 3/14/2020 3/09/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48
Text - Third - Vehicle Laws – Manufacturers and Dealers – Transfers of Franchises
Senate 3/15/2020 3/10/2020 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 49
House 3/16/2020 3/12/2020 Referred Economic Matters 49A
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 3/17/2020 3/17/2020 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 3/17/2020 3/14/2020 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 51A
House 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Third Reading Passed (99-36) 52
Senate 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Returned Passed 53C
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 3/23/2020 8:54 AM