Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Sheriff of Baltimore City - Salaries and Collective Bargaining
Sponsored by
Senator McCray
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/28 at 12:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing certain sworn law enforcement officers and court security officers in Baltimore City to collectively bargain with the Secretary of Budget and Management and the Sheriff of Baltimore City; requiring the Sheriff and the Secretary to recognize a certain exclusive representative for the purpose of collective bargaining; authorizing the Sheriff, the Secretary, and the exclusive representative to select the number of individuals designated to represent certain parties in collective bargaining; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/03/2020
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Sheriff of Baltimore City - Salaries and Collective Bargaining
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2020
Legislative Date
2/07/2020
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2020
Legislative Date
2/17/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2020
Legislative Date
2/17/2020
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2020 2/03/2020 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Sheriff of Baltimore City - Salaries and Collective Bargaining
Senate 2/07/2020 2/07/2020 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/17/2020 2/17/2020 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/17/2020 2/17/2020 Hearing 2/28 at 12:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 3:22 PM