Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Transportation Trust Fund - Use of Funds
Sponsored by
Senators Miller, Garagiola, Currie, Kasemeyer, Madaleno, Manno, McFadden, Raskin, Brinkley, Colburn, DeGrange, Edwards, Jones-Rodwell, King, Peters, and Robey
Status
Assigned a chapter number, enactment subject to constitutional referendum - Chapter 422
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Proposing an amendment to the Maryland Constitution to establish a Transportation Trust Fund to be used only for purposes relating to transportation except in specified circumstances; prohibiting the transfer of funds in the Transportation Trust Fund to the General Fund or a special fund of the State except under specified circumstances; providing that the amendment does not apply to the allocation or use of specified funds for counties, municipalities, and Baltimore City as authorized by law, or to a specified transfer of funds; etc.
Committees
Details
Constitutional Bill
Bill File Type: Regular
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
Contingency - on a referendum
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2013
Legislative Date
2/01/2013
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2013
Legislative Date
2/06/2013
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2013
Legislative Date
3/29/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2013
Legislative Date
3/25/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {629931/1
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2013
Legislative Date
3/25/2013
Action
Motion Laid Over (Senator Reilly)
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2013
Legislative Date
3/25/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {629931/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2013
Legislative Date
3/25/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2013
Legislative Date
3/26/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-2)
Proceedings
57
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2013
Legislative Date
3/26/2013
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/08/2013
Action
Rereferred to Appropriations and Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/08/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/04/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {644367/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
68
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/04/2013
Action
Special Order until later today (Delegate O'Donnell) Adopted
Proceedings
68
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/05/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
69
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/05/2013
Action
Motion Rules Suspended two readings same day (Delegate Conway) Adopted (101-31)
Proceedings
69
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/05/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (108-30)
Proceedings
69
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/07/2013
Action
Senate Concur - House Amendments
Proceedings
69
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/07/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (40-7)
Proceedings
69
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/07/2013
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
69
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/02/2013
Legislative Date
5/02/2013
Action
Assigned a chapter number, enactment subject to constitutional referendum - Chapter 422
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2013 2/01/2013 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/06/2013 2/06/2013 Hearing 2/20 at 2:00 p.m.
Senate 3/28/2013 3/29/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/29/2013 3/25/2013 Favorable with Amendments {629931/1 56
Senate 3/29/2013 3/25/2013 Motion Laid Over (Senator Reilly) 56
Senate 3/29/2013 3/25/2013 Favorable with Amendments {629931/1 Report Adopted 56
Senate 3/29/2013 3/25/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 56
Senate 3/29/2013 3/26/2013 Third Reading Passed (45-2) 57
House 4/01/2013 3/26/2013 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations 59
House 4/08/2013 4/08/2013 Rereferred to Appropriations and Ways and Means
House 4/08/2013 4/08/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 4/08/2013 4/04/2013 Favorable with Amendments {644367/1 Report Adopted 68
House 4/08/2013 4/04/2013 Special Order until later today (Delegate O'Donnell) Adopted 68
House 4/08/2013 4/05/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 69
House 4/08/2013 4/05/2013 Motion Rules Suspended two readings same day (Delegate Conway) Adopted (101-31) 69
House 4/08/2013 4/05/2013 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (108-30) 69
Senate 4/08/2013 4/07/2013 Senate Concur - House Amendments 69
Senate 4/08/2013 4/07/2013 Third Reading Passed (40-7) 69
Senate 4/08/2013 4/07/2013 Passed Enrolled 69
Post Passage 5/02/2013 5/02/2013 Assigned a chapter number, enactment subject to constitutional referendum - Chapter 422
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM