Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Education - Grounds for Discipline
Sponsored by
Senator Guzzone
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering specified procedures for suspending or dismissing specified public school personnel; authorizing specified school personnel to request arbitration under specified circumstances; specifying the procedures for arbitration; providing that an arbitrator's award is final and binding on the parties, subject to judicial review by a circuit court; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1228
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2016
Legislative Date
2/05/2016
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2016
Legislative Date
2/17/2016
Action
Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/08/2016 2/05/2016 First Reading Finance
Senate 2/17/2016 2/17/2016 Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
Date Posted Document Name
2/09/2016 Text - First - Education - Grounds for Discipline
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   6-202 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM