Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Private Passenger Motor Vehicle Liability Insurance - Underinsured Motorist Excess Coverage
Sponsored by
Senator Astle
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing for an alternative limitation on specified liability for an insurer that provides specified uninsured motorist coverage under specified circumstances; requiring specified insurers to offer underinsured motorist excess coverage; providing for the characteristics of the coverage, including what the coverage protects, how the coverage obligates the issuer, and how the selection of the coverage applies to specified policies and endorsements; providing for waivers of specified coverage in specified manners; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1146
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2014
Legislative Date
1/31/2014
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2014
Legislative Date
2/05/2014
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2014 1/31/2014 First Reading Finance
Senate 2/05/2014 2/05/2014 Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   19-509, 19-509.2, 19-510, 19-513 )
(   17-103 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM