Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Peace Orders and Protective Orders – Workplace Violence and Study
Sponsored by
Senator Sydnor
Status
In the Senate - Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Making certain provisions of law relating to the filing, issuance, and modification of certain peace orders and to the shielding of certain court records of certain peace order proceedings apply to certain peace orders filed by certain employers on the basis of certain acts committed against certain employees under certain circumstances; requiring an employer to notify an employee before the employer files a certain petition; providing immunity from civil liability to a certain employer under certain circumstances; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0126
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0555 Session: 2019 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/03/2020
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Peace Orders - Workplace Violence
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2020
Legislative Date
2/06/2020
Action
Hearing 3/11 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/18/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {378078/1
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Motion Laid Over (Senator Hough) Adopted
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {378078/1 Adopted
Proceedings
53C
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
53C
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2020 2/03/2020 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Peace Orders - Workplace Violence
Senate 2/06/2020 2/06/2020 Hearing 3/11 at 12:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/18/2020 3/18/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/18/2020 3/14/2020 Favorable with Amendments {378078/1 53
Senate 3/18/2020 3/14/2020 Motion Laid Over (Senator Hough) Adopted 53
Senate 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Favorable with Amendments {378078/1 Adopted 53C
Senate 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 53C
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-1501, 3-1502, 3-1503, 3-1503.1, 3-1504, 3-1505, 3-1506, 3-1510 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 3:23 PM