Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health Insurance - Contraceptive Equity Act
Sponsored by
Senators Kelley, Madaleno, Astle, Benson, Brochin, Conway, Currie, Feldman, Ferguson, Gladden, Guzzone, Kagan, King, Klausmeier, Lee, Manno, McFadden, Nathan-Pulliam, Pinsky, Pugh, Ramirez, Raskin, Young, and Zucker
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 436
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting health insurers, nonprofit health service plans, and health maintenance organizations from applying a copayment, coinsurance, or prior authorization requirement for specified contraceptive drugs and devices; providing that the prohibition does not apply with respect to a grandfathered health plan; establishing an exception to the prohibition against applying a copayment or coinsurance requirement for specified contraceptive drugs or devices; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1005
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): January 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2016
Legislative Date
2/05/2016
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2016
Legislative Date
3/16/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2016
Legislative Date
3/17/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {227073/1
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2016
Legislative Date
3/17/2016
Action
Laid Over (Senator Simonaire) Adopted
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {227073/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/19/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (39-5)
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/19/2016
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
51
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2016
Legislative Date
3/23/2016
Action
Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2016
Legislative Date
3/27/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2016
Legislative Date
3/27/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2016
Legislative Date
3/28/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (101-32)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2016
Legislative Date
3/29/2016
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/10/2016
Legislative Date
5/10/2016
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 436
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/08/2016 2/05/2016 First Reading Finance
Senate 2/10/2016 2/10/2016 Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/15/2016 3/16/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/17/2016 3/17/2016 Favorable with Amendments {227073/1 46
Senate 3/17/2016 3/17/2016 Laid Over (Senator Simonaire) Adopted 46
Senate 3/18/2016 3/18/2016 Favorable with Amendments {227073/1 Report Adopted 47
Senate 3/18/2016 3/18/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47
Senate 3/21/2016 3/19/2016 Third Reading Passed (39-5) 48
House 3/21/2016 3/19/2016 First Reading Health and Government Operations 51
House 3/23/2016 3/23/2016 Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/31/2016 4/01/2016 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/01/2016 3/27/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 59
House 4/01/2016 3/27/2016 Second Reading Passed 59
House 4/04/2016 3/28/2016 Third Reading Passed (101-32) 60
Senate 4/04/2016 3/29/2016 Returned Passed 58
Post Passage 5/10/2016 5/10/2016 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 436
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   15-826.1, 15-826.2, 15-831 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM