Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
To Governor
Title
Labor and Employment - General Contractor Liability for Unpaid Wages
Sponsored by
Senators Klausmeier, Benson, Feldman, and Rosapepe
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 17
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Providing that certain general contractors are jointly and severally liable for certain violations of the wage payment and collection law by a subcontractor regardless of whether the subcontractor is in a direct contractual relationship with the general contractor; requiring a subcontractor to indemnify a general contractor for certain wages, damages, interest, penalties, or fees except under certain circumstances; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Opposite:
Economic Matters
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1539
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2018
Legislative Date
2/05/2018
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2018
Legislative Date
2/07/2018
Action
Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Labor and Employment - General Contractor Liability for Unpaid Wages
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2018
Legislative Date
3/14/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/15/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/15/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Labor and Employment - General Contractor Liability for Unpaid Wages
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/17/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (33-14)
Proceedings
48C
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Referred Economic Matters
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2018
Legislative Date
3/23/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2018
Legislative Date
3/18/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {763292/1 Adopted
Proceedings
52A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2018
Legislative Date
3/18/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
52A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2018
Legislative Date
3/19/2018
Action
Motion Special Order until Later This Session (Delegate Kipke) Adopted
Proceedings
53
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2018
Legislative Date
3/19/2018
Action
Motion Vote Previous Question (Delegate Ebersole) Adopted
Proceedings
53
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2018
Legislative Date
3/19/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (85-48)
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2018
Legislative Date
3/24/2018
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2018
Legislative Date
3/24/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (31-14)
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2018
Legislative Date
3/24/2018
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
4/05/2018
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 17
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Labor and Employment - General Contractor Liability for Unpaid Wages
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2018 2/05/2018 First Reading Finance
Senate 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Labor and Employment - General Contractor Liability for Unpaid Wages
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 3/14/2018 3/14/2018 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/15/2018 3/15/2018 Favorable Adopted 47
Senate 3/15/2018 3/15/2018 Second Reading Passed 47
Text - Third - Labor and Employment - General Contractor Liability for Unpaid Wages
Senate 3/19/2018 3/17/2018 Third Reading Passed (33-14) 48C
House 3/20/2018 3/16/2018 Referred Economic Matters 50
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 3/23/2018 3/23/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/23/2018 3/18/2018 Favorable with Amendments {763292/1 Adopted 52A
House 3/23/2018 3/18/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 52A
House 3/26/2018 3/19/2018 Motion Special Order until Later This Session (Delegate Kipke) Adopted 53
House 3/26/2018 3/19/2018 Motion Vote Previous Question (Delegate Ebersole) Adopted 53
House 3/26/2018 3/19/2018 Third Reading Passed (85-48) 53
Senate 3/28/2018 3/24/2018 Senate Concurs House Amendments 55
Senate 3/28/2018 3/24/2018 Third Reading Passed (31-14) 55
Senate 3/28/2018 3/24/2018 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Labor and Employment - General Contractor Liability for Unpaid Wages
Post Passage 4/05/2018 4/05/2018 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 17
Text - Chapter - Labor and Employment - General Contractor Liability for Unpaid Wages
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 1/19/2020 9:36 AM