Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Utilities – Water and Sewage Disposal Companies – Acquisition
Sponsored by
Senator Klausmeier
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 220
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing a certain process for valuing a water company or a sewage disposal company that is the subject of a certain acquisition; prohibiting a person from acquiring a controlling interest in certain water services or sewage disposal providers without prior approval of the Public Service Commission; providing the Commission may authorize a certain acquisition if the Commission finds that it is consistent with the public convenience and necessity; establishing a process to determine the fair market value of the selling utility; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1566
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2018
Legislative Date
2/05/2018
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2018
Legislative Date
2/07/2018
Action
Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2018
Legislative Date
3/21/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2018
Legislative Date
3/19/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {737576/1
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2018
Legislative Date
3/19/2018
Action
Motion Laid Over (Senator Cassilly) Adopted
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2018
Legislative Date
3/20/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {737576/1 Adopted
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2018
Legislative Date
3/20/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2018
Legislative Date
3/21/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
52 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2018
Legislative Date
3/19/2018
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
53 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2018
Legislative Date
3/28/2018
Action
Rereferred to Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2018
Legislative Date
3/24/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
58 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2018
Legislative Date
3/26/2018
Action
Motion Special Order until 4/6 (Delegate Davis) Adopted
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/28/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/24/2018
Legislative Date
4/24/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 220
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2018 2/05/2018 First Reading Finance
Senate 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Public Utilities – Water and Sewage Disposal Companies – Acquisition
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/21/2018 3/21/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/21/2018 3/19/2018 Favorable with Amendments {737576/1 50 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/21/2018 3/19/2018 Motion Laid Over (Senator Cassilly) Adopted 50 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/22/2018 3/20/2018 Favorable with Amendments {737576/1 Adopted 51 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/22/2018 3/20/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 51 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Public Utilities – Water and Sewage Disposal Companies – Acquisition
Senate 3/23/2018 3/21/2018 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 52 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/26/2018 3/19/2018 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 53 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/28/2018 3/28/2018 Rereferred to Economic Matters
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/02/2018 4/02/2018 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 4/02/2018 3/24/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 58 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/04/2018 3/26/2018 Motion Special Order until 4/6 (Delegate Davis) Adopted 60 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2018 3/28/2018 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2018 4/02/2018 Returned Passed 64 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/24/2018 4/24/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 220
Text - Chapter - Public Utilities – Water and Sewage Disposal Companies – Acquisition
(   1-101, 4-206, 6-301 through 6-308 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:36 PM
Click to return on the top page