Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Racing Commission - Ejections from Race Tracks - Appeals
Sponsored by
Senator Simonaire
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing racing license holders to appeal an ejection by racing licensees to the State Racing Commission; authorizing the Commission to refuse to hear appeals under specified circumstances; providing for the filing of appeals with the Commission; requiring licensees to provide written statements to a license holder; requiring the Commission to conduct hearings in accordance with the Administrative Procedures Act; authorizing the Commission to take specified actions after a hearing; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Opposite:
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2013
Legislative Date
2/07/2013
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2013
Legislative Date
2/13/2013
Action
Rereferred to Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2013
Legislative Date
2/20/2013
Action
Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2013
Legislative Date
3/20/2013
Action
Unfavorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/06/2013 2/07/2013 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 2/13/2013 2/13/2013 Rereferred to Finance
Senate 2/20/2013 2/20/2013 Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/19/2013 3/20/2013 Unfavorable Report by Finance
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM