Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Crimes - Committing a Crime of Violence in the Presence of a Minor - Penalties
Sponsored by
Senators Zirkin and Forehand
Status
In the House - Hearing 4/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting a person from committing a specified crime of violence when the person knows or reasonably should know that a minor is present in a residence; establishing specified circumstances under which a minor is present; establishing an enhanced penalty not exceeding 5 years for a violation of the Act; authorizing a court to impose an enhanced penalty if the State's Attorney provides a specified written notice to the defendant and if specified elements have been proven beyond a reasonable doubt; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Opposite:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0478
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2013
Legislative Date
2/07/2013
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2013
Legislative Date
2/13/2013
Action
Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2013
Legislative Date
2/20/2013
Action
Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2013
Legislative Date
3/28/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2013
Legislative Date
3/24/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {758178/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2013
Legislative Date
3/24/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2013
Legislative Date
3/25/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-1)
Proceedings
56
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2013
Legislative Date
3/26/2013
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
4/05/2013
Action
Rereferred to Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
4/05/2013
Action
Hearing 4/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/06/2013 2/07/2013 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 2/13/2013 2/13/2013 Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/20/2013 2/20/2013 Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/27/2013 3/28/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/28/2013 3/24/2013 Favorable with Amendments {758178/1 Report Adopted 55
Senate 3/28/2013 3/24/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 55
Senate 3/29/2013 3/25/2013 Third Reading Passed (46-1) 56
House 4/01/2013 3/26/2013 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations 59
House 4/05/2013 4/05/2013 Rereferred to Judiciary
House 4/05/2013 4/05/2013 Hearing 4/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-601.1 )
Last Updated: 1/23/2020 7:40 PM