Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Family Law - Marriage - Age Requirements
Sponsored by
Senators Smith, Guzzone, Kelley, Muse, and Ramirez
Status
In the House - Conference Committee Appointed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Increasing the age that an individual under the age of majority must attain before the individual may marry under specified circumstances.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Opposite:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0484
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0911 Session: 2016 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2017
Legislative Date
2/03/2017
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Family Law - Marriage - Age Requirements
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2017
Legislative Date
2/08/2017
Action
Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2017
Legislative Date
3/24/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2017
Legislative Date
3/22/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {478572/1 Adopted
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2017
Legislative Date
3/22/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Family Law - Marriage - Age Requirements
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2017
Legislative Date
3/23/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
52
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2017
Legislative Date
3/22/2017
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
56
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
4/05/2017
Action
Rereferred to Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
4/04/2017
Action
Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
4/07/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {562613/1 Adopted
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (86-47)
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments
Proceedings
63A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Senate Requests House Recede
Proceedings
63A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Smith, Hough and Lee)
Proceedings
63A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/05/2017
Action
Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments
Proceedings
70
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/05/2017
Action
Senate Requests House Recede
Proceedings
70
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/05/2017
Action
Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Smith, Hough and Lee)
Proceedings
70
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/05/2017
Action
House Refuses Recede
Proceedings
70
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/05/2017
Action
House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Sydnor, Gibson and Kittleman)
Proceedings
70
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2017 2/03/2017 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Family Law - Marriage - Age Requirements
Senate 2/08/2017 2/08/2017 Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/24/2017 3/24/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/24/2017 3/22/2017 Favorable with Amendments {478572/1 Adopted 51
Senate 3/24/2017 3/22/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 51
Text - Third - Family Law - Marriage - Age Requirements
Senate 3/27/2017 3/23/2017 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 52
House 3/27/2017 3/22/2017 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 56
House 4/04/2017 4/05/2017 Rereferred to Judiciary
House 4/04/2017 4/04/2017 Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 4/07/2017 4/07/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 4/07/2017 3/31/2017 Favorable with Amendments {562613/1 Adopted 65
House 4/07/2017 3/31/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 65
House 4/08/2017 4/01/2017 Third Reading Passed (86-47) 66
Senate 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments 63A
Senate 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Senate Requests House Recede 63A
Senate 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Smith, Hough and Lee) 63A
House 4/10/2017 4/05/2017 Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments 70
House 4/10/2017 4/05/2017 Senate Requests House Recede 70
House 4/10/2017 4/05/2017 Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Smith, Hough and Lee) 70
House 4/10/2017 4/05/2017 House Refuses Recede 70
House 4/10/2017 4/05/2017 House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Sydnor, Gibson and Kittleman) 70
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   2-301 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM