Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Electronic Smoking Devices - Regulation and Taxation
Sponsored by
Senator Feldman
Status
In the Senate - Hearing canceled (Finance)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Limiting the in-person sales or distributions of vaping liquid by electronic smoking devices retailers and vape shop vendors to age-restricted areas; requiring electronic smoking devices retail licensees and vape shop vendors selling vaping liquid to post a certain sign in a certain manner; requiring a certain licensee who sells electronic smoking devices through a website to use a certain third-party age verification service for a certain purpose; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2020
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Contingency - on taking effect of another bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/03/2020
Action
First Reading Finance and Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Electronic Smoking Devices - Regulation and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2020
Legislative Date
2/07/2020
Action
Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Hearing canceled (Finance)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2020 2/03/2020 First Reading Finance and Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Electronic Smoking Devices - Regulation and Taxation
Senate 2/07/2020 2/07/2020 Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Senate 3/11/2020 3/11/2020 Hearing canceled (Finance)
File Code
Subjects
Age
Statutes
(   16.7-101, 16.7-201, 16.7-204.1, 16.7-301 through 16.7-303 )
(   10-107 )
(   11-104 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 3:24 PM