Bill Search
Bill number does not exist.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
To Governor
Title
Video Lottery Terminals - Racetrack Facility Renewal Account - Allocation of Funds
Sponsored by
Senators Peters, Beidle, Griffith, Guzzone, Hershey, Jennings, Reilly, and Zucker
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the allocation of funds from the Racetrack Facility Renewal Account by adding the Bowie Race Course Training Center to the list of thoroughbred racing facilities eligible to receive the funds.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Opposite:
Ways and Means  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1070
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Video Lottery Terminals - Racetrack Facility Renewal Account - Allocation of Funds
Senate 2/14/2019 2/14/2019 Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/14/2019 2/14/2019 Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/15/2019 3/15/2019 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/18/2019 3/15/2019 Favorable Adopted 47A
Senate 3/18/2019 3/15/2019 Second Reading Passed 47A
Text - Third - Video Lottery Terminals - Racetrack Facility Renewal Account - Allocation of Funds
Senate 3/18/2019 3/16/2019 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 48
House 3/19/2019 3/15/2019 Referred Ways and Means 50
House 3/20/2019 3/20/2019 Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 11/22/2019 9:37 AM