Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Natural Gas Severance Tax and Impact Account
Sponsored by
Senators Edwards and Brinkley
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Imposing a tax on the production of natural gas from specified wells in the State; setting the rate of the tax at 2.5% of gross fair market value of natural gas produced; providing for the administration of the tax by the Comptroller; providing for the distribution of revenue from the tax; establishing the Natural Gas Impact Account as a special, nonlapsing fund in the Oil and Gas Fund; requiring the Department of the Environment to administer the Account; specifying the contents of the Account; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Opposite:
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2013
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2013
Legislative Date
2/08/2013
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2013
Legislative Date
2/20/2013
Action
Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2013
Legislative Date
2/27/2013
Action
Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/07/2013 2/08/2013 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 2/20/2013 2/20/2013 Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/27/2013 2/27/2013 Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   14-124.1 )
(   10.5-101 through 10.5-301, 1-101, 13-1001, 13-1003, 13-1008, 13-1102, 13-1104, 13-201, 13-508, 13-509, 13-825, 2-102, 2-104, 2-11A-01, 2-11A-02 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM