Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Utilities - Solar Photovoltaic Systems
Sponsored by
Senator Hershey
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the application of a provision requiring the payment of a certain deposit with the Public Service Commission in connection with an application to construct a solar photovoltaic system; requiring the Commission to refund the deposit within 1 year, rather than 18 months, after a person has obtained approval if the person has demonstrated that construction has commenced; altering the period of time from 18 months to 1 year within which a person may request a certain extension for a project that has not commenced construction; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2019
Legislative Date
2/13/2019
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Public Utilities - Solar Photovoltaic Systems
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2019
Legislative Date
2/22/2019
Action
Rereferred to Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/04/2019
Action
Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/13/2019 2/13/2019 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Public Utilities - Solar Photovoltaic Systems
Senate 2/21/2019 2/22/2019 Rereferred to Finance
Senate 3/04/2019 3/04/2019 Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   9-20B-05 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM