Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Law - Use and Possession of Marijuana
Sponsored by
Senator Zirkin
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Increasing the amount of marijuana a person may use or possess and be subject to civil penalties; requiring a police officer to issue a citation under specified circumstances; establishing that specified violations involving the use or possession of a specified amount of marijuana is a Code violation; prohibiting a driver from consuming marijuana in a motor vehicle under specified circumstances; prohibiting an occupant from smoking marijuana in a motor vehicle under specified circumstances; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2016
Legislative Date
2/05/2016
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/08/2016 2/05/2016 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/10/2016 2/10/2016 Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-101, 10-107, 10-108, 5-101, 5-601, 5-601.1, 5-601.2, 5-619 )
(   21-903 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM