Bill Search
Bill number does not exist.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
To Governor
Title
Medical Cannabis - Provider Applications - Opioid Use Disorder
Sponsored by
Senator Zirkin
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Encouraging the Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Cannabis Commission to approve provider applications for patients who have an opioid use disorder only if the patient has unsuccessfully tried all other traditional treatments or the patient will use the medical cannabis in conjunction with traditional therapies.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0033
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/14/2019 2/14/2019 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Medical Cannabis - Provider Applications - Opioid Use Disorder
Senate 2/21/2019 2/22/2019 Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/22/2019 2/22/2019 Hearing 2/26 at 12:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/13/2019 3/13/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/13/2019 3/13/2019 Favorable with Amendments {618377/1 Adopted 45
Senate 3/13/2019 3/13/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 45
Text - Third - Medical Cannabis - Provider Applications - Opioid Use Disorder
Senate 3/15/2019 3/15/2019 Third Reading Passed (37-10) 47
House 3/15/2019 3/12/2019 Referred Health and Government Operations 47
House 3/19/2019 3/19/2019 Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 11/22/2019 9:37 AM