Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Weapon-Free Higher Education Zones
Sponsored by
Senators Madaleno, Benson, Conway, Currie, Feldman, Ferguson, Guzzone, Kagan, Kelley, King, Lee, Manno, McFadden, Nathan-Pulliam, Peters, Pinsky, Pugh, Ramirez, Raskin, Rosapepe, and Zirkin
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting the carrying or possession of firearms, knives, or deadly weapons on the property of public institutions of higher education; and providing for exceptions to the prohibition for law enforcement officers, a person hired for the purpose of guarding the institution's property, a person engaged in organized shooting activity for educational purposes, and a person who has a written invitation from the president of the institution to engage in a historical demonstration.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1002
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0311 Session: 2011 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2016
Legislative Date
2/05/2016
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/08/2016 2/05/2016 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/10/2016 2/10/2016 Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
Date Posted Document Name
2/09/2016 Text - First - Weapon-Free Higher Education Zones
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   4-102 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM