Bill Search
Bill number does not exist.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
To Governor
**Veto override
   SB0921 - 2016RS
   CH0002 - 2017RS
Title
Clean Energy Jobs - Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard Revisions
Sponsored by
Senators Pugh, Feldman, Benson, Madaleno, Mathias, Middleton, Pinsky, Raskin, and Muse
Status
Became law per Maryland Constitution, Chapter 2 of 2017
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the renewable energy portfolio standard percentage derived from solar energy for specified years; altering the renewable energy portfolio standard percentage derived from Tier 1 renewable sources for specified years; authorizing the Small, Minority, and Women-Owned Businesses Account to receive money from the Strategic Energy Investment Fund; requiring the Department of Labor, Licensing, and Regulation to study the workforce development training needs for the clean energy industry in the State; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Opposite:
Economic Matters
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1106
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/08/2016 2/05/2016 First Reading Finance
Senate 2/10/2016 2/10/2016 Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/31/2016 4/01/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 4/01/2016 3/28/2016 Favorable with Amendments {457976/1 57
Senate 4/01/2016 3/28/2016 Laid Over (Senator Middleton) Adopted 57
Senate 4/04/2016 3/29/2016 Favorable with Amendments {457976/1 Report Adopted 58
Senate 4/04/2016 3/29/2016 Floor Amendment (Senator Middleton) {413320/1 Adopted 58
Senate 4/04/2016 3/29/2016 Special Order until 4/5 (Senator Hershey) Adopted 58
Senate 4/05/2016 3/30/2016 Special Order until later today (Senator Hershey) Adopted 59
Senate 4/05/2016 3/30/2016 Floor Amendment (Senator Serafini) {813023/1 Rejected (14-31) 59
Senate 4/05/2016 3/30/2016 Floor Amendment (Senator Ready) {663129/1 Rejected (15-31) 59
Senate 4/05/2016 3/30/2016 Floor Amendment (Senator Hough) {503023/1 Rejected (22-22) 59
Senate 4/05/2016 3/30/2016 Floor Amendment (Senator Muse) {393723/1 Adopted 59
Senate 4/05/2016 3/30/2016 Floor Amendment (Senator Hershey) {133822/1 Adopted 59
Senate 4/05/2016 3/30/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 59
Senate 4/06/2016 3/31/2016 Third Reading Passed (31-14) 60
House 4/07/2016 3/31/2016 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations 63
House 4/07/2016 4/07/2016 Rereferred to Economic Matters
House 4/09/2016 4/09/2016 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 4/09/2016 4/04/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 67
House 4/09/2016 4/04/2016 Second Reading Passed 67
House 4/11/2016 4/05/2016 Special Order until next session (Delegate McConkey) Adopted 68
House 4/11/2016 4/07/2016 Third Reading Passed (91-48) 70
Senate 4/12/2016 4/08/2016 Returned Passed 68
Post Passage 5/31/2016 5/27/2016 Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Senate 2/02/2017 2/02/2017 Veto overridden (32-13)
House 2/07/2017 2/07/2017 Veto overridden (88-51)
Post Passage 2/07/2017 2/07/2017 Became law per Maryland Constitution, Chapter 2 of 2017
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-702, 7-703, 7-705 )
(   9-1A-35, 9-20B-01, 9-20B-05 )
Last Updated: 11/6/2019 4:13 PM