Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Climate Solutions Act of 2020 – Greenhouse Gas Emissions Reduction Act
Sponsored by
Senators Pinsky, Carter, Elfreth, Hester, Kagan, Lam, Smith, and Washington
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Increasing the greenhouse gas emissions reductions that the State must achieve by 2030; requiring the State to achieve net-zero statewide greenhouse gas emissions by 2045; requiring the Department of the Environment to adopt a final plan that reduces statewide greenhouse gas emissions by 60% by 2030 and sets the State on a path toward achieving net-zero statewide greenhouse gas emissions by 2045, on or before December 31, 2020; establishing the Climate Jobs Workgroup; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1425
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/03/2020
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs and Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2020
Legislative Date
2/05/2020
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2020 2/03/2020 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs and Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/05/2020 2/05/2020 Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Text - First - Climate Solutions Act of 2020 – Greenhouse Gas Emissions Reduction Act
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   2-1201, 2-1204.1, 2-1204.2, 2-1205, 2-1206, 2-1210, 2-1303, 2-1303.1, 2-1303.2, 2-1304, 2-1305 )
(   5-101, 5-102 )
(   12-501, 12-511 )
(   14-417, 3-602.1, 4-809 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 3:27 PM