Bill Search
Bill number does not exist.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
To Governor
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Powdered Alcoholic Beverages - Ban on Sales
Sponsored by
Senators Madaleno, Raskin, Kasemeyer, and Miller
Status
Veto sustained (0-46)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting a person from selling or offering to sell alcoholic beverages that are sold in a powder or crystalline form for direct use or use in combination with water or any other substance; providing for a penalty of up to $1,000 for a violation of the Act; and providing for the termination of the Act.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2015
History
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/01/0001 1/21/2016 Veto sustained (0-46)
Senate 3/24/2015 3/21/2015 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/24/2015 3/21/2015 Motion Rules Suspended for late introduction (Senator Madaleno) Adopted 48
Senate 3/24/2015 3/21/2015 Motion Rules Suspended Referred (Senator Madaleno) Adopted 48
Senate 3/24/2015 3/21/2015 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 48
Senate 3/25/2015 3/25/2015 Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/02/2015 4/03/2015 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/03/2015 3/29/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 56
Senate 4/03/2015 3/29/2015 Second Reading Passed 56
Senate 4/06/2015 3/30/2015 Third Reading Passed (45-2) 57
House 4/07/2015 4/01/2015 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations 62
House 4/10/2015 4/10/2015 Rereferred to Economic Matters
House 4/11/2015 4/13/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 4/13/2015 4/07/2015 Favorable with Amendments {833995/1 Report Adopted 68
House 4/13/2015 4/07/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 68
House 4/13/2015 4/08/2015 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (112-26) 69
Senate 4/13/2015 4/10/2015 Senate Concur - House Amendments 68
Senate 4/13/2015 4/10/2015 Third Reading Passed (116-23) 68
Senate 4/13/2015 4/10/2015 Passed Enrolled 68
Post Passage 5/12/2015 5/12/2015 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Senate 1/13/2016 1/13/2016 Motion Special Order vote on veto until 1/20/2016 (Senator Pugh) Adopted
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   1-102, 16-505.3 )
Last Updated: 11/6/2019 4:13 PM