Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Gun-Free Higher Education Zones
Sponsored by
Senators Smith, Madaleno, Benson, Currie, Guzzone, Kagan, King, Lee, McFadden, Nathan-Pulliam, Robinson, Rosapepe, and Zucker
Status
In the Senate - Conference Committee Appointed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering a specified exception relating to law enforcement officers to the prohibition on carrying or possessing specified weapons on school property; prohibiting the carrying or possession of specified firearms on the property of public institutions of higher education; providing specified exceptions; providing that a violation is a civil offense punishable by a fine of up to $1,000; requiring the Board of Regents for the University System of Maryland to incorporate the current weapons practice into their bylaws, policies and procedures; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Opposite:
Appropriations  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2017
Legislative Date
2/03/2017
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Weapon-Free Higher Education Zones
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2017
Legislative Date
2/08/2017
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {878776/1
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/20 (Senator Edwards) Adopted
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {878776/1 Adopted
Proceedings
46A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Floor Amendment {163423/1 (Senator Edwards)
Proceedings
46A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Motion Laid Over (Senator Edwards) Adopted
Proceedings
46A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2017
Legislative Date
3/19/2017
Action
Floor Amendment {163423/1 (Senator Edwards) Rejected (22-24)
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2017
Legislative Date
3/19/2017
Action
Floor Amendment {113720/1 (Senator Edwards) Adopted
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2017
Legislative Date
3/19/2017
Action
Floor Amendment {713625/1 (Senator Eckardt)
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2017
Legislative Date
3/19/2017
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/22 (Senator Eckardt) Adopted
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2017
Legislative Date
3/20/2017
Action
Floor Amendment {713625/1 (Senator Eckardt)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2017
Legislative Date
3/20/2017
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/23 (Senator Smith) Adopted
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2017
Legislative Date
3/21/2017
Action
Floor Amendment {713625/1 (Senator Eckardt) Withdrawn
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2017
Legislative Date
3/21/2017
Action
Floor Amendment {623022/4 (Senator Smith) Adopted
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2017
Legislative Date
3/21/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Gun-Free Higher Education Zones
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2017
Legislative Date
3/22/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (27-20)
Proceedings
51
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/24/2017
Legislative Date
3/21/2017
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
55
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
4/05/2017
Action
Rereferred to Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
4/04/2017
Action
Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
4/06/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {104463/1 Adopted
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (85-53)
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Senate Requests House Recede
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Smith, Brochin and Norman)
Proceedings
62
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2017 2/03/2017 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Weapon-Free Higher Education Zones
Senate 2/08/2017 2/08/2017 Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/17/2017 3/17/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/17/2017 3/17/2017 Favorable with Amendments {878776/1 46
Senate 3/17/2017 3/17/2017 Motion Special Order until 3/20 (Senator Edwards) Adopted 46
Senate 3/20/2017 3/17/2017 Favorable with Amendments {878776/1 Adopted 46A
Senate 3/20/2017 3/17/2017 Floor Amendment {163423/1 (Senator Edwards) 46A
Senate 3/20/2017 3/17/2017 Motion Laid Over (Senator Edwards) Adopted 46A
Senate 3/21/2017 3/19/2017 Floor Amendment {163423/1 (Senator Edwards) Rejected (22-24) 48
Senate 3/21/2017 3/19/2017 Floor Amendment {113720/1 (Senator Edwards) Adopted 48
Senate 3/21/2017 3/19/2017 Floor Amendment {713625/1 (Senator Eckardt) 48
Senate 3/21/2017 3/19/2017 Motion Special Order until 3/22 (Senator Eckardt) Adopted 48
Senate 3/22/2017 3/20/2017 Floor Amendment {713625/1 (Senator Eckardt) 49
Senate 3/22/2017 3/20/2017 Motion Special Order until 3/23 (Senator Smith) Adopted 49
Senate 3/23/2017 3/21/2017 Floor Amendment {713625/1 (Senator Eckardt) Withdrawn 50
Senate 3/23/2017 3/21/2017 Floor Amendment {623022/4 (Senator Smith) Adopted 50
Senate 3/23/2017 3/21/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 50
Text - Third - Gun-Free Higher Education Zones
Senate 3/24/2017 3/22/2017 Third Reading Passed (27-20) 51
House 3/24/2017 3/21/2017 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 55
House 4/04/2017 4/05/2017 Rereferred to Appropriations
House 4/04/2017 4/04/2017 Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
House 4/06/2017 4/06/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 4/06/2017 3/30/2017 Favorable with Amendments {104463/1 Adopted 64
House 4/06/2017 3/30/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 64
House 4/07/2017 3/31/2017 Third Reading Passed (85-53) 65
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments 62
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Senate Requests House Recede 62
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Smith, Brochin and Norman) 62
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   4-102, 4-102.1 )
Last Updated: 1/23/2020 7:45 PM