Bill Search
Bill number does not exist.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
To Governor
Title
Campaign Finance – Termination of Campaign Finance Entities
Sponsored by
Senator Kagan
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 491
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing any remaining balance in the account of a certain campaign finance entity before its termination to be paid to a certain legislative party caucus committee; requiring the authorized candidate campaign committee of a candidate who dies to pay outstanding obligations, dispose of remaining funds in a certain manner, and terminate and file a final campaign finance report within 1 year after the candidate's death; etc.
Details
Emergency Bill
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
History
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/15/2019 2/15/2019 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Campaign Finance - Death of Candidate - Termination of Campaign Committee
Senate 2/21/2019 2/22/2019 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/26/2019 2/26/2019 Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/27/2019 2/27/2019 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/27/2019 2/27/2019 Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/14/2019 3/14/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/14/2019 3/14/2019 Favorable with Amendments {964338/1 46A
Senate 3/14/2019 3/14/2019 Motion Laid Over (Senator Jennings) Adopted 46A
Senate 3/15/2019 3/15/2019 Favorable with Amendments {964338/1 Adopted 47
Senate 3/15/2019 3/15/2019 Floor Amendment {403626/2 (Senator Jennings) Adopted 47
Senate 3/15/2019 3/15/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47
Text - Third - Campaign Finance - Death of Candidate - Termination of Campaign Committee
Senate 3/18/2019 3/16/2019 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 48
House 3/19/2019 3/15/2019 Referred Ways and Means 50
House 3/19/2019 3/19/2019 Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 4/05/2019 4/05/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 4/05/2019 3/29/2019 Favorable with Amendments {285867/1 Adopted 64
House 4/05/2019 3/29/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 64
House 4/06/2019 3/30/2019 Third Reading Passed (140-0) 65
Senate 4/08/2019 4/01/2019 Senate Concurs House Amendments 64
Senate 4/08/2019 4/01/2019 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 64
Senate 4/08/2019 4/01/2019 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Campaign Finance – Termination of Campaign Finance Entities
Post Passage 5/13/2019 5/13/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 491
Text - Chapter - Campaign Finance – Termination of Campaign Finance Entities
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   13-247, 13-310.1 )
Last Updated: 11/22/2019 9:37 AM