Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Board of Heating, Ventilation, Air-Conditioning, and Refrigeration Contractors - Maintenance Technician - License Requirements
Sponsored by
Senator Klausmeier
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the qualifications for a maintenance technician license to be issued by the State Board of Heating, Ventilation, Air-Conditioning, and Refrigeration Contractors; establishing a specified fee for the issuance or renewal of a maintenance technician license; limiting the subjects on a specified examination for a specified license; requiring the Board to send a specified notice to a specified applicant under specified circumstances; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1568
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2016
Legislative Date
2/05/2016
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {904034/1
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
Committee Amendment Adopted
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
Special Order until 3/21 (Senator Hershey) Adopted
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/19/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
48A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2016
Legislative Date
3/20/2016
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
52
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/24/2016
Legislative Date
3/24/2016
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
4/08/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/08/2016 2/05/2016 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/10/2016 2/10/2016 Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/17/2016 3/18/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/18/2016 3/18/2016 Favorable with Amendments {904034/1 47
Senate 3/18/2016 3/18/2016 Committee Amendment Adopted 47
Senate 3/18/2016 3/18/2016 Special Order until 3/21 (Senator Hershey) Adopted 47
Senate 3/21/2016 3/18/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted 47A
Senate 3/21/2016 3/18/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47A
Senate 3/21/2016 3/19/2016 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 48A
House 3/22/2016 3/20/2016 First Reading Economic Matters 52
House 3/24/2016 3/24/2016 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/07/2016 4/08/2016 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   9A-101, 9A-207, 9A-302, 9A-304, 9A-305, 9A-308, 9A-402, 9A-501 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM