Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Refillable Containers - Class 5 Manufacturer's License
Sponsored by
Senator Brinkley
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 589
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the State Comptroller to issue a refillable container permit to a holder of a Class 5 manufacturer's license; providing for the renewal of the permit; authorizing a holder of a refillable container permit to sell draft beer in specified refillable containers for consumption off the licensed premises; specifying the hours of sale for the permit; providing that a holder of the permit may refill only a refillable container that was branded by the permit holder; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2013
Legislative Date
2/14/2013
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2013
Legislative Date
2/20/2013
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/22/2013
Legislative Date
2/22/2013
Action
Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2013
Legislative Date
3/18/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2013
Legislative Date
3/17/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2013
Legislative Date
3/17/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2013
Legislative Date
3/19/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2013
Legislative Date
3/18/2013
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
51
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2013
Legislative Date
3/26/2013
Action
Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2013
Legislative Date
4/03/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2013
Legislative Date
3/28/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2013
Legislative Date
3/28/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/02/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/03/2013
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/16/2013
Legislative Date
5/16/2013
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 589
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/13/2013 2/14/2013 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 2/20/2013 2/20/2013 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/22/2013 2/22/2013 Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/15/2013 3/18/2013 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/19/2013 3/17/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 48
Senate 3/19/2013 3/17/2013 Second Reading Passed 48
Senate 3/21/2013 3/19/2013 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 50
House 3/21/2013 3/18/2013 First Reading Economic Matters 51
House 3/26/2013 3/26/2013 Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/02/2013 4/03/2013 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 4/03/2013 3/28/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 61
House 4/03/2013 3/28/2013 Second Reading Passed 61
House 4/08/2013 4/02/2013 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 66
Senate 4/08/2013 4/03/2013 Returned Passed 65
Post Passage 5/16/2013 5/16/2013 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 589
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM