Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Calvert County - Office of the Sheriff - Correctional Deputies
Sponsored by
Calvert County Senators
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 98
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the Sheriff of Calvert County to appoint correctional deputies in a number and at a salary approved by the County Commissioners; providing that correctional deputies serve under the Sheriff of Calvert County; requiring Calvert County correctional deputies to complete certain training provided by the Maryland Police and Correctional Training Commissions; providing that certain Calvert County correctional deputies may become merit system employees under certain circumstances; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
Contingency - on a contingency described in Sec. 3 of the bill
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/15/2019
Legislative Date
2/15/2019
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Calvert County - Office of the Sheriff - Correctional Deputies
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2019
Legislative Date
2/22/2019
Action
Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/22/2019
Legislative Date
2/22/2019
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Calvert County - Office of the Sheriff - Correctional Deputies
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/14/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
46AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Referred Judiciary
Proceedings
46AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2019
Legislative Date
3/22/2019
Action
Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
4/05/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/29/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
65 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/31/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/18/2019
Legislative Date
4/18/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 98
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Calvert County - Office of the Sheriff - Correctional Deputies
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/15/2019 2/15/2019 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Calvert County - Office of the Sheriff - Correctional Deputies
Senate 2/21/2019 2/22/2019 Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/22/2019 2/22/2019 Hearing 3/05 at 12:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/11/2019 3/11/2019 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/12/2019 3/12/2019 Favorable Adopted 44 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/12/2019 3/12/2019 Second Reading Passed 44 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Calvert County - Office of the Sheriff - Correctional Deputies
Senate 3/14/2019 3/14/2019 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 46AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/14/2019 3/11/2019 Referred Judiciary 46AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/22/2019 3/22/2019 Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2019 4/05/2019 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 4/05/2019 3/29/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 64 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2019 3/30/2019 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 65 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2019 3/31/2019 Returned Passed 63 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/18/2019 4/18/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 98
Text - Chapter - Calvert County - Office of the Sheriff - Correctional Deputies
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM
Click to return on the top page