Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Chesapeake Employers' Insurance Company - Rate Regulation
Sponsored by
Senator Klausmeier
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Analysis
Synopsis
Subjecting the Chesapeake Employers' Insurance Company to rate regulation under a specified competitive rating law; requiring the Company, the Maryland Insurance Administration, and a specified rating organization jointly to develop a plan that transitions the Company to be a fully affiliated member of a specified rating organization beginning January 1, 2019; specifying elements to be included in the plan; providing for a delayed effective date for portions of the Act; etc.
Committees
Original:
Rules
Opposite:
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1438
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013, January 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/14/2013
Legislative Date
2/15/2013
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/14/2013 2/15/2013 First Reading Senate Rules
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-303, 24-305 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM