Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Ethics - Disclosures and Fines and Penalties - Revisions
Sponsored by
Senator Washington
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the amount of certain fees and fines that may be imposed by the State Ethics Commission for certain purposes; altering a certain requirement for a certain official to disclose the acceptance of certain tickets or free admission to certain events on a financial disclosure statement; requiring each member of the General Assembly to submit a certain annual notice regarding a certain meeting with the Ethics Counsel to the presiding officers of the General Assembly; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/03/2020
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2020
Legislative Date
2/05/2020
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Public Ethics - Disclosures and Fines and Penalties - Revisions
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2020
Legislative Date
3/06/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {354135/1 Adopted
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2020
Legislative Date
3/06/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Public Ethics - Disclosures and Fines and Penalties - Revisions
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/08/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Referred Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
47B
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2020 2/03/2020 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/05/2020 2/05/2020 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Public Ethics - Disclosures and Fines and Penalties - Revisions
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/11/2020 3/11/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/11/2020 3/06/2020 Favorable with Amendments {354135/1 Adopted 45
Senate 3/11/2020 3/06/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 45
Text - Third - Public Ethics - Disclosures and Fines and Penalties - Revisions
Senate 3/13/2020 3/08/2020 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 47
House 3/13/2020 3/10/2020 Referred Environment and Transportation 47B
House 3/16/2020 3/16/2020 Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 5/4/2020 5:21 PM