Bill Search
Bill number does not exist.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
To Governor
Title
Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard - Tier 1 Renewable Sources - Qualifying Natural Gas
Sponsored by
Senator Pipkin
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Expanding the definition of a Tier 1 renewable source to include qualifying natural gas for purposes of the renewable energy portfolio standard.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Opposite:
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): January 1, 2014
History
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/14/2013 2/15/2013 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 2/20/2013 2/20/2013 Rereferred to Finance
Senate 2/27/2013 2/27/2013 Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-701, 7-704 )
Last Updated: 11/6/2019 4:13 PM