Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Commercial Daily Fantasy Sports - Authorization and Regulation
Sponsored by
Senator Peters
Status
In the House - Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the State Lottery and Gaming Control Commission, with the assistance of the State Lottery and Gaming Control Agency, to regulate the operation of Internet fantasy sports games; requiring a person to have a license in order to offer Internet fantasy sports games to the public; requiring that a licensed operator conduct Internet fantasy sports games in a specified manner; requiring an Internet fantasy sports player to register with a licensed operator and to be at least 21 years of age; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Opposite:
Ways and Means  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
Contingency - on a referendum
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/11/2016
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2016
Legislative Date
2/19/2016
Action
Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/24/2016
Legislative Date
2/24/2016
Action
Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/22/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2016
Legislative Date
3/20/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2016
Legislative Date
3/20/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2016
Legislative Date
3/21/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/24/2016
Legislative Date
3/22/2016
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
54
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2016
Legislative Date
4/04/2016
Action
Rereferred to Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2016
Legislative Date
4/04/2016
Action
Hearing 4/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/11/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/10/2016 2/11/2016 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 2/18/2016 2/19/2016 Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/24/2016 2/24/2016 Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/21/2016 3/22/2016 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/22/2016 3/20/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 49
Senate 3/22/2016 3/20/2016 Second Reading Passed 49
Senate 3/23/2016 3/21/2016 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 50
House 3/24/2016 3/22/2016 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations 54
House 4/04/2016 4/04/2016 Rereferred to Ways and Means
House 4/04/2016 4/04/2016 Hearing 4/07 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/11/2016 4/11/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   9-1B-01 through 9-1B-10 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM