Bill Search
Bill number does not exist.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
To Governor
Title
Real Property - Agricultural Land Preservation Easements - Separate Parcels
Sponsored by
Senator Serafini
Status
In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Extending the termination date to June 30, 2021, for certain provisions establishing that, unless a deed expressly provides otherwise, the grant of a certain agricultural land preservation easement governing certain parcels of land does not consolidate the parcels for any other purpose, and that a certain parcel subject to a certain easement may be conveyed separately to a certain child with certain approval of the Maryland Agricultural Land Preservation Foundation, but remains subject to the easement in perpetuity; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2019
History
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/18/2019 2/18/2019 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Real Property - Agricultural Land Preservation Easements - Separate Parcels
Senate 2/21/2019 2/22/2019 Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/25/2019 2/25/2019 Hearing 3/13 at 12:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/08/2019 4/08/2019 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/08/2019 3/31/2019 Favorable Adopted 63
Senate 4/08/2019 3/31/2019 Second Reading Passed 63
Text - Third - Real Property - Agricultural Land Preservation Easements - Separate Parcels
Senate 4/08/2019 4/01/2019 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 64
House 4/08/2019 4/01/2019 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 67
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   2-513.2 )
Last Updated: 11/22/2019 9:37 AM