Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Optional Retirement Program - Eligibility - Alterations
Sponsored by
Senator Peters
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 458
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the eligibility provisions of the Optional Retirement Program to include individuals in specified position categories designated by specified governing boards of institutions of higher education or the Secretary of Higher Education; requiring an individual who was a participant in the Optional Retirement Program as of a specified date to continue to participate in the Program under specified circumstances; and conforming specified terminology to current institutional policies regarding employment categories.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Opposite:
Appropriations  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0926
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2016
Legislative Date
2/12/2016
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2016
Legislative Date
2/19/2016
Action
Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/24/2016
Legislative Date
2/24/2016
Action
Hearing 3/10 at 8:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2016
Legislative Date
3/09/2016
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2016
Legislative Date
3/09/2016
Action
Hearing 3/10 at 8:30 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2016
Legislative Date
3/14/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2016
Legislative Date
3/14/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {599533/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2016
Legislative Date
3/14/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2016
Legislative Date
3/16/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
45
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2016
Legislative Date
3/14/2016
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2016
Legislative Date
4/05/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2016
Legislative Date
3/29/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2016
Legislative Date
3/29/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2016
Legislative Date
3/30/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/10/2016
Legislative Date
5/10/2016
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 458
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/11/2016 2/12/2016 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 2/18/2016 2/19/2016 Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/24/2016 2/24/2016 Hearing 3/10 at 8:00 a.m.
Senate 3/09/2016 3/09/2016 Hearing cancelled
Senate 3/09/2016 3/09/2016 Hearing 3/10 at 8:30 a.m.
Senate 3/12/2016 3/14/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/14/2016 3/14/2016 Favorable with Amendments {599533/1 Report Adopted 43
Senate 3/14/2016 3/14/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 43
Senate 3/16/2016 3/16/2016 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 45
House 3/17/2016 3/14/2016 First Reading Appropriations 46
House 3/18/2016 3/18/2016 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/04/2016 4/05/2016 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 4/05/2016 3/29/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 61
House 4/05/2016 3/29/2016 Second Reading Passed 61
House 4/06/2016 3/30/2016 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 62
Senate 4/07/2016 4/01/2016 Returned Passed 61
Post Passage 5/10/2016 5/10/2016 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 458
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM