Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Gaming - Traditional Noncommercial Fantasy Competitions - Clarification
Sponsored by
Senator Miller
Status
In the House - Hearing 4/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting a person from offering or participating in a commercial game or competition that includes the elements of consideration, chance, and reward; requiring specified units of State and local government to narrowly construe sections of law that authorize specified types of gaming; altering the definition of fantasy sports competitions; providing for regulation of specified fantasy sports competitions by the State Lottery and Gaming Control Commission; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Opposite:
Ways and Means  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): January 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2016
Legislative Date
2/12/2016
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2016
Legislative Date
2/19/2016
Action
Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/24/2016
Legislative Date
2/24/2016
Action
Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/22/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2016
Legislative Date
3/20/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {319035/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2016
Legislative Date
3/20/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2016
Legislative Date
3/21/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/24/2016
Legislative Date
3/22/2016
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
54
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2016
Legislative Date
3/29/2016
Action
Rereferred to Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2016
Legislative Date
4/04/2016
Action
Hearing 4/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/11/2016 2/12/2016 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 2/18/2016 2/19/2016 Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/24/2016 2/24/2016 Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/21/2016 3/22/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/22/2016 3/20/2016 Favorable with Amendments {319035/1 Report Adopted 49
Senate 3/22/2016 3/20/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 49
Senate 3/23/2016 3/21/2016 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 50
House 3/24/2016 3/22/2016 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations 54
House 3/29/2016 3/29/2016 Rereferred to Ways and Means
House 4/04/2016 4/04/2016 Hearing 4/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   12-102, 12-113, 12-114 )
(   9-1B-01, 9-1B-02 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM