Bill Search
Bill number does not exist.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
To Governor
Title
Vehicle Laws - Protective Headgear Requirement for Motorcycle Riders - Exception
Sponsored by
Senators Hough, Carter, Cassilly, Eckardt, Edwards, Ready, Salling, Simonaire, Smith, and West
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/28 at 12:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing that the prohibition against operating or riding on a motorcycle without certain protective headgear does not apply to an individual at least 21 years old who has been licensed to operate a motorcycle for at least 2 years, has completed a certain motorcycle safety course, or is a passenger on a motorcycle operated by a driver who has been licensed for at least 2 years or has completed a certain motorcycle safety course.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0439 Session: 2018 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2019
History
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/18/2019 2/18/2019 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Vehicle Laws - Protective Headgear Requirement for Motorcycle Riders - Exception
Senate 3/14/2019 3/15/2019 Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/19/2019 3/19/2019 Hearing 3/28 at 12:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   21-1306 )
Last Updated: 11/22/2019 9:37 AM