Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Confidentiality of Juvenile Records - Baltimore City Mayor's Office on Criminal Justice
Sponsored by
Senators Hayes, Carter, Ferguson, and Washington
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 37
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing that certain provisions of law relating to the confidentiality of juvenile police records and court records do not prohibit access to and confidential use of certain records concerning a child by the Baltimore City Mayor's Office on Criminal Justice if the Office is providing services to the child; specifying that the Baltimore City Mayor's Office on Criminal Justice shall be liable for the unauthorized release of a police record it accesses under the Act; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): September 1, 2019
Contingency - on a contingency described in Sec. 2 of the bill
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2019
Legislative Date
2/18/2019
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2019
Legislative Date
2/22/2019
Action
Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2019
Legislative Date
2/25/2019
Action
Hearing 3/14 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2019
Legislative Date
3/21/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2019
Legislative Date
3/20/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
52 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2019
Legislative Date
3/20/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
52 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2019
Legislative Date
3/21/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
53 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2019
Legislative Date
3/18/2019
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
53AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Rereferred to Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
4/05/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/29/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
65 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/31/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/18/2019
Legislative Date
4/18/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 37
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/18/2019 2/18/2019 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Confidentiality of Juvenile Records - Baltimore City Mayor's Office on Criminal Justice
Senate 2/21/2019 2/22/2019 Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/25/2019 2/25/2019 Hearing 3/14 at 12:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/21/2019 3/21/2019 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/22/2019 3/20/2019 Favorable Adopted 52 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/22/2019 3/20/2019 Second Reading Passed 52 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Confidentiality of Juvenile Records - Baltimore City Mayor's Office on Criminal Justice
Senate 3/25/2019 3/21/2019 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 53 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/26/2019 3/18/2019 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 53AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/29/2019 4/01/2019 Rereferred to Judiciary
House 4/02/2019 4/02/2019 Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2019 4/05/2019 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 4/05/2019 3/29/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 64 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2019 3/30/2019 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 65 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2019 3/31/2019 Returned Passed 63 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/18/2019 4/18/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 37
Text - Chapter - Confidentiality of Juvenile Records - Baltimore City Mayor's Office on Criminal Justice
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM
Click to return on the top page