Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Procedure - Citation Authority
Sponsored by
Senator Raskin
Status
In the House - Hearing 4/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing a police officer to charge by citation for the crimes of sale of an alcoholic beverage to an underage drinker or intoxicated person, malicious destruction of property if the amount of damage to property is less than $500, and theft of property or services with a value of less than $1,000; and making the Act an emergency measure.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Opposite:
Judiciary  
Details
Emergency Bill
Cross-filed with: HB0742
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/15/2013
Legislative Date
2/18/2013
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2013
Legislative Date
2/20/2013
Action
Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2013
Legislative Date
2/21/2013
Action
Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2013
Legislative Date
3/27/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2013
Legislative Date
3/27/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2013
Legislative Date
3/28/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (43-0)
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2013
Legislative Date
3/27/2013
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
4/05/2013
Action
Rereferred to Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
4/05/2013
Action
Hearing 4/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/15/2013 2/18/2013 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 2/20/2013 2/20/2013 Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/21/2013 2/21/2013 Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/29/2013 4/01/2013 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/01/2013 3/27/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 58
Senate 4/01/2013 3/27/2013 Second Reading Passed 58
Senate 4/02/2013 3/28/2013 Third Reading Passed (43-0) 59
House 4/02/2013 3/27/2013 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations 60
House 4/05/2013 4/05/2013 Rereferred to Judiciary
House 4/05/2013 4/05/2013 Hearing 4/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM