Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Natural Resources - Wildlife Trafficking Prevention
Sponsored by
Senator Young
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a person from purchasing, selling, offering for sale, or possessing with the intent to sell specified parts or products of specified animal species under specified circumstances, subject to specified exceptions; establishing specified penalties for a violation of the Act; requiring that fines and restitution imposed under the Act be credited to the Department of Natural Resources for the benefit of the Birdwatcher's Fund to be used for the preservation of nongame wildlife species and threatened or endangered species; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0542
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2016
Legislative Date
2/12/2016
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2016
Legislative Date
2/19/2016
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2016
Legislative Date
2/19/2016
Action
Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2016
Legislative Date
3/10/2016
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2016
Legislative Date
3/14/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/11/2016 2/12/2016 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 2/18/2016 2/19/2016 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/19/2016 2/19/2016 Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/10/2016 3/10/2016 Hearing cancelled
Senate 3/11/2016 3/14/2016 Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-2A-06.1, 10-2B-01 through 10-2B-10 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM