Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Inheritance, Recordation, and Transfer Taxes - Exemptions for Domestic Partners - Repeal
Sponsored by
Senators Kittleman and Brinkley
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; Withdrawn
Analysis
Synopsis
Repealing an exemption from the inheritance tax for specified property that passes from a decedent to or for the use of a domestic partner of a decedent under specified circumstances; repealing an exemption from recordation tax and State and county transfer taxes for specified instruments of writing transferring property between domestic partners and former domestic partners under specified circumstances; etc.
Committees
Opposite:
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/15/2013
Legislative Date
2/18/2013
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2013
Legislative Date
2/20/2013
Action
Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2013
Legislative Date
2/27/2013
Action
Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2013
Legislative Date
3/07/2013
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2013
Legislative Date
3/11/2013
Action
Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/15/2013 2/18/2013 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 2/20/2013 2/20/2013 Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/27/2013 2/27/2013 Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/07/2013 3/07/2013 Hearing cancelled
Senate 3/11/2013 3/11/2013 Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   12-101, 12-108, 13-207, 13-403 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM