Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Perpetual Conservation Easements
Sponsored by
Senators Peters, Middleton, and Miller
Status
In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing a subtraction modification under the Maryland income tax for the first $250,000 in proceeds from the sale of a perpetual conservation easement on real property in the State; and applying the Act to all taxable years beginning after December 31, 2017.
Committees
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0254 Session: 2017 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2018
Legislative Date
2/05/2018
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2018
Legislative Date
2/07/2018
Action
Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Hearing 3/14 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/15/2018
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2018 2/05/2018 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Perpetual Conservation Easements
Senate 3/12/2018 3/12/2018 Hearing canceled
Senate 3/12/2018 3/12/2018 Hearing 3/14 at 2:00 p.m.
Senate 3/15/2018 3/15/2018 Withdrawn by Sponsor
(   10-207 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:36 PM
Click to return on the top page