Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Vehicle-Miles-Traveled Tax - Prohibited Acts
Sponsored by
Senator Pipkin
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting the State from imposing or levying a vehicle-miles-traveled tax or other similar fees, tolls, or taxes; and prohibiting the State from requiring the installation of a device in or on a privately owned vehicle or using an odometer reading to facilitate the reporting of the number of vehicle miles traveled for the purpose of calculating a tax, fee, toll, or any other levy.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Opposite:
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2013
Legislative Date
2/20/2013
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2013
Legislative Date
2/21/2013
Action
Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2013
Legislative Date
2/27/2013
Action
Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/19/2013 2/20/2013 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 2/21/2013 2/21/2013 Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/27/2013 2/27/2013 Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   22-107 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM